U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:87-cr-50031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dubray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 19, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 14, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.