U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drapeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 11, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 11, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 05, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 04, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Bail Report]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.