U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 21, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2022: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 20, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 15, 2021: [Reconsideration]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 22, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 20, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Request]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Indictment]
  • January 08, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 07, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Objection]
  • October 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 21, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Request]
  • May 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • May 20, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.