U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 22, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 19, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.