open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:20-40200
    Party Name:Stephanie Rose Nelson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:May 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:May 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.sdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54671
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =