U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson (JUV)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Receipt]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 19, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 18, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.