U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderst et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 07, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 24, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 24, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 02, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 20, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 28, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea and Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Request]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 13, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 29, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 26, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • June 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 17, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 12, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 12, 2020: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.