U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • August 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 04, 2021: [Consent]
  • June 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 03, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 19, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Joinder]
  • August 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 08, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Arraignment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 19, 2020: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • June 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.