U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swift
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • April 13, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 12, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 24, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 24, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 02, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 17, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.