U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 02, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 14, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.