U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trevino-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 12, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.