U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 24, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [Evaluation]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • September 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.