U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2021: [Verdict]
  • July 07, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 07, 2021: [Court Trial - Completed]
  • July 06, 2021: [Court Trial - Began]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Consent]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2021: [Certificate]
  • March 05, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 05, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 22, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response]
  • December 15, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • December 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 01, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 24, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 26, 2020: [Request]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.