U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schumacher et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 26, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 18, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 27, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 17, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 17, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 21, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 07, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 07, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 02, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 08, 2021: [Leave to]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 10, 2020: [Response]
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Suppress]
  • November 06, 2020: [Leave to]
  • November 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 31, 2020: [For Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.