U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 02, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 02, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 02, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Bail Report]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 30, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 29, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 26, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 25, 2020: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 25, 2020: [Request]
  • June 25, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • June 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 23, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.