U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-10044
  • Case Name: Rhonda Lynn Keller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
April, 2021
  • April 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale (Text Entry)]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
November, 2020
  • November 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Vacating Order (Text Order)]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.