open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:20-cr-50044-1
    Party Name:USA v. Durham
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Existing Document]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68868
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =