U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-50101
  • Case Name: Todd Alan Larson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - hrng held (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (Text Order)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objecting to Discharge (Rule 4004)]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • July 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • July 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.