U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30013
  • Case Name: Aaron Daniel McKnight and April Dawn Warner McKnight
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Mortgage]
  • July 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.