U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40270
  • Case Name: Todd Duane Magnuson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
  • April 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Support Document]
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (text entry)]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismiss Case]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismissing Corporate Joint Debtor]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • July 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Creditor List]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.