U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arcoren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 05, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 09, 2020: [Furlough]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 29, 2020: [Request]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 27, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2020: [Request]
  • July 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.