U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • July 31, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.