U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-50110
  • Case Name: Joshua Kingsley Schlacht and Jessica Lynn Schlacht
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • August 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • July 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.