open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:20-cv-04115
    Party Name:South Dakota Board of Regents v. Discount Seeds, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?69139
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =