U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 24, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2021: [Extend]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2020: [Request]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.