U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kettwig
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.