U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 16, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 15, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 08, 2020: [Request]
  • September 04, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 31, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.