U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • August 20, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 20, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 19, 2020: [Request]
  • August 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.