U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Derby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 30, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 30, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Consent]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Request]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2020: [Bail Report]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 14, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.