U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Verbrugge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2020: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 25, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 25, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.