U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escobar-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 03, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.