U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extend]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 16, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 16, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extend]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 02, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Furlough]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Furlough]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Response]
  • March 30, 2021: [For Order]
  • March 29, 2021: [For Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 12, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 12, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • March 09, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 02, 2020: [Furlough]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Request]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Request]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.