U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 21, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 14, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • September 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Response]
  • September 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2020: [Request]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2020: [Bail Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.