U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heminger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 04, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 01, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extend]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • November 29, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • November 29, 2021: [Seal Existing Document]
  • November 24, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 03, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.