U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 16, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2020: [Request]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 19, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.