U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Redday
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 20, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2020: [Request]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 28, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 28, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 27, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.