U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 06, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 06, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 05, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • April 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 08, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extend]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 22, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 02, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • December 01, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Verdict]
  • December 01, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 30, 2021: [Jury List]
  • November 29, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Memorandum Letter]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Witness List]
  • November 24, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 23, 2021: [For Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Witness List]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extend]
  • November 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • November 15, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extend]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2020: [Request]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.