U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzales-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 18, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
  • August 18, 2020: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.