U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flying Horse et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 20, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • January 13, 2023: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2023: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Consent]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 31, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 31, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 01, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response]
  • April 27, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 27, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 22, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Waiver]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 21, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 23, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Discovery]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • January 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 07, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 01, 2021: [Affidavit]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Objection]
  • November 29, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Objection]
  • November 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extend]
  • November 05, 2021: [Objection]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 14, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 08, 2021: [Objection]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice]
  • September 29, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 29, 2021: [Objection]
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 29, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 27, 2021: [Objection]
  • September 15, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2021: [Objection]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice]
  • September 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2021: [Bill of Particulars]
  • September 10, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 09, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice]
  • September 09, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 03, 2021: [Objection]
  • September 01, 2021: [Objection]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 30, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 25, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2021: [Request]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 16, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 16, 2021: [Extend]
  • August 13, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extend]
  • August 09, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extend]
  • August 02, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice]
  • June 03, 2021: [Recusal]
  • June 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 26, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 22, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • February 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 19, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 12, 2021: [Recusal]
  • February 10, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • February 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 27, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Declaration]
  • January 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice]
  • January 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice]
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Response]
  • December 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2020: [Response]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2020: [Furlough]
  • December 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 19, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 13, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
  • November 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 05, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 30, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 20, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 20, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 16, 2020: [Furlough]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 13, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 21, 2020: [Request]
  • September 18, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 17, 2020: [Request]
  • September 11, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 02, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 31, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Text Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Request]
  • August 26, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 24, 2020: [Request]
  • August 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 24, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.