U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Giron-Arguijo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • December 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 23, 2020: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 18, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 18, 2020: [Indictment]
  • August 17, 2020: [Request]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.