U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 22, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2020: [Request]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.