U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [Response]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2020: [Request]
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.