U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 26, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 24, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 05, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.