U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hopkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Response]
  • October 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [New Trial]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 26, 2022: [Verdict]
  • August 26, 2022: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • August 26, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 26, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 26, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • August 25, 2022: [Jury List]
  • August 25, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 16, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2022: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2021: [Objection]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 15, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2020: [Indictment]
  • August 20, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.