U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Truax
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • April 04, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 15, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Verdict]
  • November 03, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • November 03, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 03, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 02, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2021: [Jury List]
  • November 01, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 01, 2021: [In Limine]
  • November 01, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 14, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 24, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Indictment]
  • August 20, 2020: [Request]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.