U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 25, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 30, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 30, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2021: [Evaluation]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • December 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Request]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.