U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garibay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 12, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 12, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 24, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 24, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 03, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2020: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • October 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2020: [Request]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.