U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 20, 2021: [Furlough]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 20, 2021: [Bail Report]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 17, 2020: [Request]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.