U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bissonette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sealed Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 26, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2022: [Supplement]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Psychiatric Report Received]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 05, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 24, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 11, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 10, 2020: [Furlough]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Request]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.