U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-30019
  • Case Name: Chev Michael Hackett and Elizabeth Rose Hackett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
February, 2022
  • February 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Default]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • October 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • October 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • September 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - hrng held (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Approve Lease]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Adequate Protection]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (prior Court approval required)]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reply]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (text order)]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • February 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (Text Order)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reject Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (prior Court approval required)]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
October, 2020
  • October 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • September 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.